VA HB1952 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Patient care team podiatrist definition; physician assistant supervision requirements. Establishes the role of "patient care team podiatrist" as a provider of management and leadership to physician assistants in the care of patients as part of a patient care team. The bill modifies the supervision requirements for physician assistants by establishing a patient care team model. The bill directs the Board of Medicine to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill and is identical to SB 1209.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient care teams; podiatrists and physician assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0137)
2019-02-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 137 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1952ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1952H1
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105098D-H1
2019-01-25HouseRead second time
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105098D-H1
2019-01-22HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103320D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412900(n/a)See Bill Text
5412951.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412952.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5412953(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1952
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1952+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1952H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1952ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0137+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1201V0006+HB1952
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0020+HB1952
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1909+HB1952
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0184+HB1952
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1952+HB1952
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1952+HB1952

Bill Comments

feedback