VA HB1951 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child support; proportionate share of health insurance premiums. Provides that only the proportionate share of a health insurance premium for a child who is the subject of a support order shall be added to the child support obligation. The bill requires that, if the per child cost is not provided by the insurer, the cost per person be determined by subtracting the cost of individual coverage for the policy holder from the total cost of the coverage and dividing the remainder by the number of remaining covered persons.
Title
Child support; proportionate share of health insurance premiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1951ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101169D |