VA HB1927 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special identification card; applicants who are blind or vision impaired. Requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to, upon request of the applicant, indicate on an applicant's special identification card that he is blind or vision impaired.
Title
Special identification card; applicants who are blind or vision impaired.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0075) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 75 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1927ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101147D |