VA HB1922 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Delta-8 tetrahydrocannabinol; distribution; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor to sell, give, distribute, or possess with intent to sell, give, or distribute delta-8 tetrahydrocannabinol, except as authorized in the Drug Control Act. The bill directs the Department of Forensic Science to determine the proper methods for detecting delta-8 tetrahydrocannabinol in substances.
Title
Delta-8 tetrahydrocannabinol; distribution, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N) (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102478D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 247 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.1:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |