VA HB1921 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; unexpended local funds; capital projects. Permits any school board to finance capital projects with any funds appropriated to it by the local governing body that are unexpended by the school board in any year.
Title
School boards; unexpended local funds may be used to finance capital projects.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100687D |