VA HB1921 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assault and battery; health care providers; penalty. Expands the penalty for battery against a health care provider who is engaged in the performance of his duties to apply in hospitals or in emergency rooms on the premises of any clinic or other facility rendering emergency care. Under current law, the penalties only apply to a battery against an emergency health care provider. The bill requires the Department of Health to work with stakeholder groups to develop guidelines regarding the publication of penalties for battery on a health care provider and for the training of health care professionals and providers in violence prevention programs. This bill is identical to SB 973.
Title
Battery; expands penalty when against health care provider.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 29 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2017 | |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/13/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1921ER) |
2017-02-10 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103712D |