VA HB192 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Rainwater and gray water; regulations. Directs the State Board of Health (the Board) to adopt regulations regarding the use of gray water and rainwater. The regulations shall provide standards for the use of rainwater harvesting systems, which shall include systems that collect rainwater for use by commercial enterprises but do not provide water for human consumption. Such regulations shall not apply to water that is not for human consumption, including graywater and rainwater, that is used by certain specified facilities. The bill also directs the Board to consider recognizing rainwater as an independent source of fresh water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rainwater and gray water; regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 817 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB192ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2018-04-02HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB192ER)
2018-03-05SenateSigned by President
2018-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB192ER)
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-02-26SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB192H1
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106324D-H1
2018-02-09HouseRead second time
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106324D-H1
2018-02-06HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-27HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-12-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101454D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321248.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB192
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB192+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB192H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB192ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB192ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0817+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1201V0025+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H12V0076+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0518+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0240+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0676HB0192+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0689HB0192+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1193+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1633+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1254HB0192+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1255HB0192+HB0192
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1256HB0192+HB0192

Bill Comments

feedback