VA HB1918 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for audio-only telehealth services. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage beginning January 1, 2024, for the cost of health care services provided through audio-only telehealth services, defined in the bill as counseling interventions designed to facilitate a patient's achievement of human development goals and remediate mental, emotional, or behavioral disorders and associated distresses that interfere with mental health and development by a mental health professional delivered to a patient via audio-only means when no other means of real-time two-way audio-visual or other telecommunications or electronic communications are available and operational to the patient or the patient does not have the capability to use such real-time two-way means of communication. The bill requires that prescribing of controlled substances via audio-only telehealth services comply with state requirements for prescribing controlled substances and all applicable federal law. Health insurance; coverage for audio-only telehealth services. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage beginning January 1, 2024, for the cost of health care services provided through audio-only telehealth services, defined in the bill as counseling interventions designed to facilitate a patient's achievement of human development goals and remediate mental, emotional, or behavioral disorders and associated distresses that interfere with mental health and development by a mental health professional delivered to a patient via audio-only means when no other means of real-time two-way audio-visual or other telecommunications or electronic communications are available and operational to the patient or the patient does not have the capability to use such real-time two-way means of communication. The bill requires that prescribing of controlled substances via audio-only telehealth services comply with state requirements for prescribing controlled substances and all applicable federal law.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for audio-only telehealth services, definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 23104173D-E |
2023-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1918E |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104173D |