VA HB1913 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; prohibited contracts; agency-branded marketing materials. Prohibits state agencies from entering into any contract for the purchase of goods that (i) are branded with such state agency's name, logo, insignia, or other designation and (ii) are being purchased for the purpose of advertising, marketing, or promotion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; prohibited contracts, agency-branded marketing materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in General Laws
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-18HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101985D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224342.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback