VA HB1910 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Drug paraphernalia and controlled paraphernalia; fentanyl testing products. Clarifies that narcotic testing products used to determine whether a controlled substance contains fentanyl are not drug paraphernalia or controlled paraphernalia.
Title
Drug paraphernalia and controlled paraphernalia; fentanyl testing products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101076D |