VA HB1908 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1908
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; noncompliance with rental agreement; prohibition on using negative credit information that arose during a closure of the United States Government against certain applicants for tenancy; penalty. Prohibits a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units in the Commonwealth from taking any adverse action against an applicant for tenancy based solely on payment history or an eviction for nonpayment of rent that occurred during a closure of the United States government when such applicant was a directly affected individual, defined as an individual who was furloughed or otherwise did not receive payments as a result of a closure of the United States government and was (i) an employee of the United States government, (ii) an independent contractor of the United States government, or (iii) an employee of a company under contract with the United States government. If such a landlord denies an applicant for tenancy, the bill requires the landlord to provide the applicant written notice of the denial and of the applicant's right to assert that his failure to qualify was based solely on payment history or an eviction based on nonpayment of rent that occurred during the proscribed period when such applicant was a directly affected individual. If a landlord does receive a response from the applicant asserting such a right, and the landlord relied upon a consumer or tenant screening report, the landlord must make a good faith effort to contact the generator of the report to ascertain whether such determination was due solely to the applicant for tenancy's payment history or an eviction for nonpayment that occurred during the proscribed period and that such applicant was a directly affected individual. The bill permits an applicant for tenancy to recover damages of up to $1,000, along with attorney fees, from landlords who do not comply with these requirements. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; noncompliance with rental agreement; prohibition on using negative credit information that arose during a closure of the United States Government against certain applicants for tenancy; penalty. Prohibits a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units in the Commonwealth from taking any adverse action against an applicant for tenancy based solely on payment history or an eviction for nonpayment of rent that occurred during a closure of the United States government when such applicant was a directly affected individual, defined as an individual who was furloughed or otherwise did not receive payments as a result of a closure of the United States government and was (i) an employee of the United States government, (ii) an independent contractor of the United States government, or (iii) an employee of a company under contract with the United States government. If such a landlord denies an applicant for tenancy, the bill requires the landlord to provide the applicant written notice of the denial and of the applicant's right to assert that his failure to qualify was based solely on payment history or an eviction based on nonpayment of rent that occurred during the proscribed period when such applicant was a directly affected individual. If a landlord does receive a response from the applicant asserting such a right, and the landlord relied upon a consumer or tenant screening report, the landlord must make a good faith effort to contact the generator of the report to ascertain whether such determination was due solely to the applicant for tenancy's payment history or an eviction for nonpayment that occurred during the proscribed period and that such applicant was a directly affected individual. The bill permits an applicant for tenancy to recover damages of up to $1,000, along with attorney fees, from landlords who do not comply with these requirements.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; noncompliance with rental agreement, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 0 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 0 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 5-N 2-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported from General Laws (14-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101428D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1908 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Landlord and Tenant
Property and Conveyances
United States Government
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act
Property and Conveyances
United States Government
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act