VA HB1900 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional licenses issued to providers of behavioral health and developmental services; notice requirement; waiver of appeal right by consent agreement. Requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to direct any provider who is issued a provisional license to review all pertinent state and federal regulations and other contractual agents with payor sources to determine any limitations that may be placed on such provider by any other agency of the Commonwealth, including restrictions on reimbursement that may be imposed by the Department of Medical Assistance Services. The bill requires that a consent agreement signed by such provider waiving his right to appeal a provisional license issuance decision shall direct the provider to review all pertinent state and federal regulations and contractual agents to determine any restrictions on reimbursement that may be imposed by other state agencies or payor sources and that a copy of the signed consent agreement be provided to the Department of Medical Assistance Services. The bill requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and the Department of Medical Assistance Services to develop a joint agency protocol that requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to collaborate and consult with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services prior to imposing limitations on a provider that could lead to restrictions on reimbursement. Provisional licenses issued to providers of behavioral health and developmental services; notice requirement; waiver of appeal right by consent agreement. Requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to direct any provider who is issued a provisional license to review all pertinent state and federal regulations and other contractual agents with payor sources to determine any limitations that may be placed on such provider by any other agency of the Commonwealth, including restrictions on reimbursement that may be imposed by the Department of Medical Assistance Services. The bill requires that a consent agreement signed by such provider waiving his right to appeal a provisional license issuance decision shall direct the provider to review all pertinent state and federal regulations and contractual agents to determine any restrictions on reimbursement that may be imposed by other state agencies or payor sources and that a copy of the signed consent agreement be provided to the Department of Medical Assistance Services. The bill requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and the Department of Medical Assistance Services to develop a joint agency protocol that requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to collaborate and consult with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services prior to imposing limitations on a provider that could lead to restrictions on reimbursement.
Title
Behavioral health and developmental services; provisional licenses issued to providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781) | |
2023-04-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 781 (effective 7/1/23) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1900ER2) |
2023-04-12 | House | Reenrolled |
2023-04-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-03-27 | House | Governor's substitute printed 23107754D-H1 |
2023-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1900ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 23100684D-E |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1900E |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100684D |