VA HB19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; public institutions of higher education; disclosure required by certain offerors; civil penalty. Requires every offeror who is awarded a contract by a public institution of higher education for any construction project that has a total cost of $5 million or more to disclose any contributions the offeror has made within the previous five-year period totaling $25,000 or more to the public institution of higher education or any private foundation that exists solely to support the public institution of higher education. The bill provides that no protest of an award shall lie for a claim that the selected offeror was awarded a contract solely based on such offeror's contribution to the public institution of higher education. The bill imposes a $500 civil penalty on any offeror that knowingly fails to submit the required disclosure. The provisions of the bill relating to such disclosure of gifts made by an offeror to a public institution of higher education or any private foundation that exists solely to support the public institution of higher education expire on June 30, 2027.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; public higher educational institutions, disclosure by offerors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097) | |
2022-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB19ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB19H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106373D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106373D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2021-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100261D |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0096)
SB210 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0096)
SB210 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0096)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Virginia Public Procurement Act
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Virginia Public Procurement Act