VA HB19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1064)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1064)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; repeal of photo identification requirements; additional forms of identification accepted; signed statement in lieu of required form of identification; penalty. Removes the requirement that voters show a form of identification containing a photograph in order to be allowed to vote. The bill requires a voter to show either his voter registration confirmation documents; his valid Virginia driver's license, his valid United States passport, or any other identification issued by the Commonwealth, one of its political subdivisions, or the United States; any valid student identification card issued by any institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth or any private school located in the Commonwealth; any valid student identification card issued by any institution of higher education located in any other state or territory of the United States; any valid employee identification card containing a photograph of the voter and issued by an employer of the voter in the ordinary course of the employer's business; or a copy of a current utility bill, bank statement, government check, paycheck, or other government document that shows the name and address of the voter. The bill also provides that the expiration date on a Virginia driver's license is not considered when determining the validity of a driver's license offered for voter identification purposes. A voter who does not show one of the required forms of identification when offering to vote is required to sign a statement that he is the named registered voter he claims to be in order to be permitted to cast a ballot. Such statement is signed subject to felony penalties for making false statements, punishable as a Class 5 felony. A voter who does not show one of the required forms of identification and does not complete or sign the statement shall be offered a provisional ballot according to the provisions of current law. The bill adds language regarding identification requirements for certain voters pursuant to the federal Help America Vote Act of 2002.
Title
Voter identification; signed statement in lieu of required form of identification, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 94-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 94-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1064) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1064 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB19ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (54-Y 45-N) |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Locke, Ebbin, Peake |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Delegates: Lindsey, Simon, Robinson |
2020-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108329D-S1 (1-Y 94-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB19S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108329D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108329D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB19H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107618D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Incorporates HB878 (Sickles) |
2020-02-07 | House | Incorporates HB190 (Levine) |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107618D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100460D |
Same As/Similar To
HB190 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB878 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HB878 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 411.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 643 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |