VA HB1883 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle insurance policies; foster parents and foster children. Prohibits an insurer from refusing to issue or failing to renew a motor vehicle insurance policy solely because of the status of the applicant or policyholder, as applicable, as a foster care provider or a person in foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle insurance policies; foster parents and foster children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1883ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1883H1
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104986D-H1
2019-01-22HouseRead second time
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104986D-H1
2019-01-17HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101891D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3822212(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback