VA HB186 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drugs and paraphernalia forfeited to law enforcement. Provides that seized drugs and drug paraphernalia, the lawful possession of which is not established or the title to which cannot be ascertained, may be forfeited to a law-enforcement agency for training purposes pursuant to a court order. Current law limits such forfeiture to the Department of Forensic Science for research and training purposes. Limitations are placed on the amount of drugs that a law-enforcement agency may retain and monthly inventories must be submitted to the chief law-enforcement officer in writing. Drugs must be destroyed within 12 months of being obtained and time, place, and manner of destruction must be certified to the court.
Title
Seized drugs and paraphernalia; forfeiture to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Stolle [R] | Del. Barry Knight [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Del. Scott Taylor [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. James Leftwich [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 99 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB186ER) |
2014-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-14 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14104780D-S1 (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB186S1 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104780D-S1 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104780D-S1 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB186H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104208D-H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Incorporates HB481 |
2014-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104208D-H1 |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102443D |
Same As/Similar To
HB481 (Similar To) 2014-01-20 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB349 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
SB349 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)