VA HB1859 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1859ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1859ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Local financing of clean energy and other programs; when owner costs are incurred. Changes the parameters for local ordinances authorizing loan contracts for the installation by property owners of clean energy, resiliency, or stormwater management improvements. The bill provides that if the property owner incurred the costs of improvements to be refinanced or reimbursed within two years of the locality's issuance of a certificate of occupancy or other evidence that the clean energy, resiliency, or stormwater management improvements comply substantially with the plans and specifications previously approved by the locality, the loan amount may include the total costs of the improvements to be refinanced or reimbursed. The bill removes the requirement that the applicable local ordinance include the proposed interest rate for the loan program and the maximum aggregate dollar amount that may be financed with respect to a property, and it provides that no loan offered under the program shall be used to improve a residential dwelling that contains fewer than five dwelling units or a residential condominium. The bill alters the fee options available to the locality and provides that the placement of a voluntary special assessment lien does not require a new assessment of the value of the real property. The bill contains technical amendments. Local financing of clean energy and other programs; when owner costs are incurred. Changes the parameters for local ordinances authorizing loan contracts for the installation by property owners of clean energy, resiliency, or stormwater management improvements. The bill provides that if the property owner incurred the costs of improvements to be refinanced or reimbursed within two years of the locality's issuance of a certificate of occupancy or other evidence that the clean energy, resiliency, or stormwater management improvements comply substantially with the plans and specifications previously approved by the locality, the loan amount may include the total costs of the improvements to be refinanced or reimbursed. The bill removes the requirement that the applicable local ordinance include the proposed interest rate for the loan program and the maximum aggregate dollar amount that may be financed with respect to a property, and it provides that no loan offered under the program shall be used to improve a residential dwelling that contains fewer than five dwelling units or a residential condominium. The bill alters the fee options available to the locality and provides that the placement of a voluntary special assessment lien does not require a new assessment of the value of the real property. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Clean energy and other programs; local financing when owner costs are incurred.
Sponsors
Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N 1-A) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1859ER) |
2021-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 2-N 2-A) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 38-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House (61-Y 38-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1859H1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103098D-H1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103098D-H1 |
2021-01-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101155D |