VA HB1847 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Sports betting; technical amendments. Clarifies the types of events on which sports betting is allowed. The bill clarifies that a permit issued to a casino operator shall not count toward the maximum of 12 permits that the Director of the Virginia Lottery can issue and makes technical amendments related to the interaction between sports betting law and casino gaming law. Sports betting; technical amendments. Clarifies the types of events on which sports betting is allowed. The bill clarifies that a permit issued to a casino operator shall not count toward the maximum of 12 permits that the Director of the Virginia Lottery can issue and makes technical amendments related to the interaction between sports betting law and casino gaming law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports betting; clarifies certain procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (67-Y 33-N) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (67-Y 33-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (67-Y 33-N)
2021-01-26HousePrinted as engrossed 21103448D-EH1
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1847EH1
2021-01-26HouseAmendments by Delegate Scott agreed to
2021-01-26HouseAmendments by Delegate Scott withdrawn
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103448D-H1
2021-01-26HouseRead second time
2021-01-25HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103448D-H1
2021-01-21HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100487D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5814030(n/a)See Bill Text
5814031(n/a)See Bill Text
5814032(n/a)See Bill Text
5814039(n/a)See Bill Text
5814100(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1847
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1847+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1847H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1847EH1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1847AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1847AHR
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103244D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103244.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1847F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1847FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1847FEH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1103V0002+HB1847
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0046+HB1847
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1193+HB1847
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0114+HB1847

Bill Comments

feedback