VA HB1841 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-25 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund; required deposits. Eliminates the requirement that certain revenues be deposited in the Revenue Stabilization Fund that are in excess of the deposits required by the Constitution of Virginia and adds a new requirement that additional deposits be made to the Revenue Reserve Fund if general fund revenues exceed certain amounts in a fiscal year. Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund; required deposits. Eliminates the requirement that certain revenues be deposited in the Revenue Stabilization Fund that are in excess of the deposits required by the Constitution of Virginia and adds a new requirement that additional deposits be made to the Revenue Reserve Fund if general fund revenues exceed certain amounts in a fiscal year.
Title
Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund; elimination of certain required deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-25 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2023-02-25 | House | No further action taken |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Knight, Austin, Torian |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Norment, Deeds |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 23107070D-S1 (0-Y 96-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1841S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23107070D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23107070D-S1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 23100414D-E |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1841E |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100414D |