VA HB1837 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Testimony in open court in divorce cases; notice. Allows the court to conduct ore tenus hearings in divorce cases without providing further notice to the defendant if the defendant has been personally served and has failed to appear. Under current law, the court may take depositions without further notice to the defendant if the defendant has been personally served and has failed to appear. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Judicial Council of Virginia.
Title
Divorce cases; conduct an ore tenus hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081) | |
2013-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 81 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1837ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101005D-E |
2013-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1837E |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101005D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1046 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)