VA HB1830 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1830
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; Board of Directors; membership; small business lending experience. Requires at least five of the nine citizen members of the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority to have experience in small business lending. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission.
Title
Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; members to have small business lending experience.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101296D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1830 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)