VA HB1827 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (4-Y 8-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Tethering animals; adequate space. Provides that a tether meets the requirement that an animal be given adequate space if the tether is four times the length of the animal or 15 feet long, whichever is greater, and does not cause injury or pain or weigh more than one-tenth of the animal's body weight. The bill provides that the walking of an animal on a leash by its owner shall not constitute tethering for the purpose of the definition of "adequate space."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tethering animals; adequate space.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (4-Y 8-N 1-A) (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (76-Y 22-N) (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N) (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateFailed to report (defeated) in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (4-Y 8-N 1-A)
2019-02-07SenateCommittee amendments
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (76-Y 22-N)
2019-01-22HousePassed House (76-Y 22-N)
2019-01-22HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-22HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 18-N)
2019-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (79-Y 18-N)
2019-01-21HousePrinted as engrossed 19102116D-E
2019-01-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1827E
2019-01-21HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-21HouseRead second time
2019-01-18HouseRead first time
2019-01-16HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102116D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback