VA HB180 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Health Research Board; staffing. Provides that employees of the Commonwealth Health Research Board, which provides financial support for health research funded through assets distributed to the Commonwealth as a policyholder pursuant to the conversion of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Virginia, shall be employees of the Department of Accounts and shall be entitled to all benefits available to state employees. The bill directs the Board to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the Department of Accounts concerning staff support. The Board currently has one full-time employee.
Title
Commonwealth Health Research Board; certain employees shall be entitled to state employee benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0683) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 683 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB180ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-07 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB180H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105035D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105035D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100616D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Educational Institutions
Labor and Employment
Pensions, Benefits, and Retirement
Educational Institutions
Labor and Employment
Pensions, Benefits, and Retirement