VA HB1788 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable gaming; winner-take-all games. Reinstates the conduct of "winner-take-all" bingo games for charitable organizations. The bill also increases from 55 to 60 the number of bingo games that may be played in a session of bingo, and reduces the number of progressive games from six to three.
Title
Charitable gaming; winner-take-all games.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100505D |
Subjects
Charitable, Civic and Volunteer Institutions, and Organizations
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Gambling, Lotteries, Etc.
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Gambling, Lotteries, Etc.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.30:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1788 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1788+hil |