VA HB1781 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Farmers markets; farm and forest land conversion; plans. Removes the requirements that certain agencies analyze the impact of regulations on the conversion of farm and forest lands and that the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services summarize the reports of the operators of state-owned farmers markets to the General Assembly.
Title
Farmers' markets; farm and forest land conversion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 5 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 16, 2017 | |
2017-02-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/9/17 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1781ER) |
2017-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101487D |