VA HB1779 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Civil commitment proceedings; fees and compensation. Increases from $25 to $75 the fee paid to court-appointed counsel representing a person in a civil commitment proceeding under Title 19.2 of the Code of Virginia. The bill also provides that court-appointed counsel representing a person acquitted of a felony by reason of insanity in a hearing to assess the need for inpatient hospitalization shall be paid a fee not to exceed $445. This bill is a recommendation of the Judicial Council of Virginia.
Title
Civil commitment proceedings; fees and compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102142D |