VA HB1769 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Persons under age 21 driving after consuming alcohol. Eliminates the element that the underlying consumption of alcohol by a person under the age of 21 must have been illegal in order to be guilty of the offense of a person under the age of 21 operating a motor vehicle after consuming alcohol. The bill provides, instead, that such person shall have an affirmative defense to the offense if such person's consumption of alcohol was lawful.
Title
Driving after consuming alcohol; persons under age 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100014D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 266.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 492 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1769 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1769+hil |