VA HB1769 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; plan management and rate review. Authorizes the State Corporation Commission (SCC) to perform plan management functions for participation in the federal health benefit exchange established by the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to § 1321 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. This obligation is contingent upon the availability of full funding, technology infrastructure being made available to the SCC, there being no other impediments that effectively prevent the SCC from performing any required plan management functions, and that the performance of such plan management functions is not deemed to establish a health benefit exchange pursuant to § 1311 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. In addition, the SCC's obligation to perform plan management functions is contingent upon receiving federal funding sufficient to pay the operating expenses necessary to carry out the functions. The SCC may contract with and enter into memoranda of understanding to carry out its plan management functions with any state or federal agency. The measure also authorizes the SCC to review and approve accident and sickness insurance premium rates applicable to health benefit plans in the individual and small group markets and health benefit plans providing health insurance coverage in the individual market through certain non-employer group plans. The power to review and approve rates is a condition to the SCC being found to be an effective regulator of such rates. The measure provides that no agent, employee, officer, or agency of the Commonwealth is authorized to take any action to establish, or that could be deemed to establish, a health benefit exchange pursuant to § 1311 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. Finally, the measure authorizes the Virginia Department of Health to assist in the plan management functions.
Title
Health insurance; SCC, et al., to perform plan management functions, review of premium rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670) | |
2013-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 670 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1769ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 40-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105047D-S1 (60-Y 40-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (30-Y 10-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1769S1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105047D-S1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105047D-S1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (10-Y 5-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 30-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (70-Y 30-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13104489D-EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1769EH1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment by Delegate Marshall, R.G. agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Motion to pass by Amendments by Delegate Marshall, R.G. agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Emergency clause deleted |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment by Delegate Kilgore agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104489D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104489D-H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13103480D |
Same As/Similar To
SB922 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Health
Insurance
State Corporation Commission
United States Government
Health
Insurance
State Corporation Commission
United States Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 137.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 316.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 326 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |