VA HB1764 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Physician assistants; practice agreement exemption; elimination of practice ratio for physicians and physician assistants. Allows physician assistants practicing in hospitals, certain facilities operated by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, or federally qualified health centers designated by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to practice without a practice agreement if the credentialing and privileging requirements of the applicable facility include a practice arrangement, as described in the bill. The bill also eliminates the practice ratio for physicians and physician assistants; under current law, patient care team physicians and patient care team podiatrists are not allowed to collaborate or consult with more than six physician assistants at any one time. Physician assistants; practice agreement exemption; elimination of practice ratio for physicians and physician assistants. Allows physician assistants practicing in hospitals, certain facilities operated by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, or federally qualified health centers designated by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to practice without a practice agreement if the credentialing and privileging requirements of the applicable facility include a practice arrangement, as described in the bill. The bill also eliminates the practice ratio for physicians and physician assistants; under current law, patient care team physicians and patient care team podiatrists are not allowed to collaborate or consult with more than six physician assistants at any one time.
Title
Physician assistants; practice agreement exemption, elimination of practice ratio.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103722D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2951.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2952 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2952.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2953 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |