VA HB1761 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of taxicabs. Provides that the governing body of any county, city, or town that regulates taxicabs may authorize any taxicab to operate software-based devices that utilize GPS or other measurement data in the calculation of time-and-distance fares, notwithstanding the requirements for the specifications and tolerances for measuring and weighing devices. The bill repeals the requirement that all taxicabs display roof signs and specific markings. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Regulation of taxicabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 528 (effective 3/16/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1761ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103625D-E |
2017-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1761E |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2017-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103625D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 2059.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2062 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |