VA HB1756 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; subtraction for military veterans with a permanent service-connected disability. Establishes for taxable years beginning January 1, 2019, an individual income tax subtraction for the military retirement income of veterans with a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability. The bill provides that the subtraction is available only for taxpayers whose federal adjusted gross income is no greater than 150 percent of the federal poverty level for a four-person household.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for military veterans with a permanent service-connected disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-21 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100403D |