VA HB1753 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School buildings; electronic room partitions. Prohibits school employees from opening or closing an electronic room partition in any school building except under certain limited circumstances. The bill requires any annual safety review or exercise for school employees in a local school division to include information and demonstrations, as appropriate, regarding the operation of such partitions. The bill also requires the Department of Education to make available to each school board model safety guidance regarding the operation of such partitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School buildings; electronic room partitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 369 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1753ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1753H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106060D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106060D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-21HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2018-12-21HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100322D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221138(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1753
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1753+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1753H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1753ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0369+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0901V0024+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0074+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2139+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2213+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0246+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1753+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB1753+HB1753
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3044+HB1753

Bill Comments

feedback