VA HB175 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Foreign business entities; service of process. Establishes that the registered agent of a foreign stock or nonstock corporation, limited liability company, or business trust may be served with a subpoena for depositions, discovery, or documents, regardless of where the documents are located.
Title
Foreign business entities; service of process on registered agent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor with letter (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100864D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 1223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 766 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 928 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |