VA HB1733 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Advanced Production Grant Program and Fund. Creates the Advanced Production Grant Program and Fund to make grant payments to an eligible business transportation manufacturer and producer that engages in the production of business trucks and that makes a capital investment of at least $58 million at a facility in Pittsylvania County and creates at least 703 new full-time jobs at the facility. The eligible company would be eligible for an aggregate of $7 million in grants paid out over a five-year period if it meets such performance parameters and complies with the terms of a memorandum of understanding agreed upon by the qualified company, the Commonwealth, and the Virginia Economic Development Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Production Grant Program and Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 267 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1733ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
2020-02-05HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2020-01-24HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-22HousePresented and ordered printed 20105213D
2020-01-22HouseUnanimous consent to introduce

Same As/Similar To

SB1014 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591284.33(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback