VA HB1727 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Lottery; personal identifying information of prize winners; Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA). Provides that a lottery prize winner may request the Virginia Lottery to withhold from public disclosure his name and other personal identifying information for a period of one year after the date of winning the prize, except that the prize amount and the hometown of the prize winner shall continue to be disclosed as provided in current law. The bill also amends the FOIA exemption for the Virginia Lottery to provide that the personal identifying information of a lottery winner is exempt from mandatory disclosure for one year if the lottery winner has opted to have his personal identifying information withheld from disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Lottery; personal identifying information of prize winners, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in General Laws
2019-01-10HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-08HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-12-19HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-12-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100298D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
5814012.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback