VA HB1721 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Handheld speed monitoring devices; civil penalty. Handheld speed monitoring devices; civil penalty. Authorizes law-enforcement officers to operate handheld photo speed monitoring devices, defined in the bill, in or around school crossing zones and highway work zones for the purpose of recording images of vehicles that are traveling at speeds of at least 10 miles per hour above the posted school crossing zone or highway work zone speed limit within such school crossing zone or highway work zone when such highway work zone is indicated by conspicuously placed signs displaying the maximum speed limit and the use of such handheld photo speed monitoring device. The bill provides that the operator of a vehicle shall be liable for a monetary civil penalty, not to exceed $125, if such vehicle is found to be traveling at speeds of at least 10 miles per hour above the posted highway work zone or school crossing zone speed limit by the handheld photo speed monitoring device. The bill provides that if the summons for a violation is issued by mail the violation shall not be reported on the driver's operating record or to the driver's insurance agency, but if the violation is personally issued by an officer at the time of the violation, such violation shall be part of the driver's record and used for insurance purposes. The bill provides that the civil penalty will be paid to the locality in which the violation occurred.
Title
Handheld speed monitoring devices; civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1442-Jones) by voice vote |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104962D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1442 (Similar To) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1232)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 882 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 882.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1721 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1721+hil |