VA HB1721 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Child abuse and neglect; mandatory reporters. Adds to the list of persons who are required to report suspected child abuse or neglect ministers, priests, rabbis, imams, and duly accredited practitioners of any religious organization or denomination usually referred to as a church; however, the bill exempts such clergy members from the mandatory reporting requirement when the information supporting the suspicion of child abuse or neglect (i) is required by the doctrine of the religious organization or denomination to be kept confidential or (ii) would be subject to the exemptions set forth in §8.01-400 or 19.2-271.3 if offered as evidence in court.
Title
Child abuse and neglect; mandatory reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101444D |