VA HB1721 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; surviving spouses of members of armed forces killed in action. Exempts from taxation the dwelling of the principal residence of a surviving spouse of a member of the armed forces of the United States killed in action. If the value of the dwelling is in excess of the average assessed value of dwellings in the locality situated on property zoned as single family residential, then the portion of the value in excess of such average assessed value shall be subject to taxation. Pursuant to subdivision (b) of Section 6-A of Article X of the Constitution of Virginia, which was adopted by the voters in 2014, the General Assembly previously enacted legislation exempting from taxation the principal residence of such surviving spouse only if the assessed value of the residence was not in excess of the averaged assessed value. This bill exempts the portion of the residence below the average assessed value, regardless of the full assessed value of the dwelling.
Title
Real property tax; exemption for surviving spouses of members of armed forces killed in action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 577 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1721ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105186D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1721S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105186D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105186D-S1 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (10-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101172D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3219.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3360.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3360.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |