VA HB1710 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; gun safes. Establishes an exemption from retail sales tax for the purchase of a gun safe with a selling price of $1,000 or less. The bill defines a gun safe as a safe or vault that is (i) commercially available, (ii) secured with a digital or dial combination locking mechanism or biometric locking mechanism, and (iii) designed for the storage of a firearm or ammunition for use in a firearm. Under the bill, a gun safe does not include a glass-faced cabinet.
Title
Gun safes; establishes an exemption from retail sales tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101380D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1710 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1710+hil |