VA HB1707 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certain tax credits; elimination of state-level charitable contribution deductions when such credits are claimed. Prohibits a taxpayer from claiming a charitable contribution deduction in calculating Virginia taxable income if a neighborhood assistance tax credit or an education improvement scholarships tax credit is claimed for the same donation. The prohibition is effective for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2017.
Title
Tax credits, certain; elimination of state-level charitable contribution deductions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101777D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1707 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1707+hil |