VA HB170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cutting of grass and weeds; Goochland County. Adds Goochland County to the list of those localities that have authority to require the cutting of grass and weeds under certain circumstances on occupied property. The county currently has such authority on unoccupied property.
Title
Grass and weeds; Goochland County authorized to require cutting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 383 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB170ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 15-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100540D |