VA HB1699 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Passed by for the day
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
House of Delegates districts; technical adjustment. Changes district assignments of two census blocks between Districts 25 and 26 in Rockingham County in order to reflect a new precinct line. Each district will have a deviation of less than one percent from the ideal district population.
Title
House of Delegates districts; technical adjustment to Districts 25 and 26 in Rockingham County.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 71 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (69-Y 30-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Governor's veto overridden (69-Y 30-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1699ER) |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100891D |