VA HB1699 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Restoration of firearms rights; hearings. Makes parallel the process for the request for and conduct of a hearing requested by a person to restore his right to possess or carry a firearm after being acquitted by reason of insanity, adjudicated legally incompetent or mentally incapacitated, or involuntarily committed for mandatory treatment.
Title
Restoration of firearms rights; any person may petition court to restore his right, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 6-N) (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 6-N) (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0775) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 775 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1699ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 16-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 24-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (74-Y 24-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1699ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105531D-S2 (85-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1699S2 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Reynolds agreed to 11105531D-S2 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 11105410D-S1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 11105531D-S2 (Reynolds) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105410D-S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1699H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105146D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105146D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101180D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |