VA HB1690 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Line of Duty Act; Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority police officers. Expands the list of disabled persons and the beneficiaries of disabled or deceased persons eligible to receive benefits under the Line of Duty Act to include Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority police officers whose disability or death occurs as a direct or proximate result of the performance of their duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Line of Duty Act; Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority police officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2018-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-12-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100109D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91400(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback