VA HB1685 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conveyance of property located in the City of Richmond; Department of General Services. Authorizes the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to convey to P&J Properties, Inc., a parcel of land located in the City of Richmond in Shockoe Bottom as described in a survey dated December 5, 2012. Under the bill, the conveyance shall not be deemed a conveyance of surplus property and there shall be no requirement for the payment of any consideration.
Title
General Services, Department of; conveyance of certain real property located in City of Richmond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0421) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 421 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1685ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105219D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1685S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105219D-S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105219D-S1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101900D |