VA HB1674 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Abuse and neglect of incapacitated adults; informed consent. Clarifies, for the purposes of the exemptions to abuse and neglect of incapacitated adults, that the informed consent or a declaration of the incapacitated person must have been given when such person was not incapacitated and that any wishes of the incapacitated person relied upon must have been made known when such person was not incapacitated. The bill provides that its provisions are declaratory of existing law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abuse and neglect of incapacitated adults; informed consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 234 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1674ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePrinted as engrossed 19100716D-E
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1674E
2019-01-24HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-03HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100716D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182369(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1674
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1674+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1674E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1674ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0234+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0004+HB1674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0009+HB1674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1846+HB1674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0260+HB1674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB1674+HB1674
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0582HB1674+HB1674

Bill Comments

feedback