VA HB1671 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Qualified projects of natural gas utilities. Exempts any natural gas utility serving fewer than 2,000 residential customers and fewer than 350 commercial and industrial customers in the year in which the utility makes an investment for qualifying projects from the provision that limits the amount of investment that a natural gas utility may make in qualifying projects to one percent of its net plant investment that was used in establishing base rates in its most recent rate case. The existing exemption to the one percent cap was enacted in 2013 and applies to any natural gas utility serving fewer than 1,000 residential customers and fewer than 250 commercial and industrial customers in such year. Legislation enacted in 2012 established a mechanism for natural gas utilities to recover the eligible infrastructure development costs of a qualifying project through future rates. A qualifying project is an economic development project for which, among other things, the utility has received a binding commitment from the developer or occupant of the proposed project regarding capacity or a financial guaranty from the developer or state or local government in the amount of at least 50 percent of the estimated investment to be made in the proposed project. This bill is identical to SB 1289.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural gas utilities; qualified projects, investments in eligible infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 780 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1671ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-03HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1671ER)
2017-02-20HouseEnrolled
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-24HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23HousePrinted as engrossed 17102752D-E
2017-01-23HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1671E
2017-01-23HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-01-23HouseRead second time
2017-01-20HousePassed by for the day
2017-01-19HouseRead first time
2017-01-17HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
2017-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102752D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1671
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1671+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1671E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1671ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1671ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0780+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H14V0032+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1517+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S02V0103+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB1671+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0597HB1671+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0598HB1671+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0599HB1671+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2873+HB1671
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1154HB1671+HB1671

Bill Comments

feedback