VA HB1668 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sales and use tax exemption; legal tender coins. Exempts legal tender coins whose total transaction sales price exceeds $1,000 from sales and use tax and extends from January 1, 2019, to June 30, 2022, the same exemption for gold, silver, or platinum bullion. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2018. The provisions of the bill expire on June 30, 2022. This bill is identical to SB 934.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Sales and Use Tax; exempts legal tender coins.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-20 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
2017-02-20 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 48 (effective 1/1/18)
2017-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
2017-02-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
2017-02-13SenateSigned by President
2017-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1668ER)
2017-02-13HouseEnrolled
2017-02-09SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-09SenateRead third time
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-26HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 17101298D-E
2017-01-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1668E
2017-01-25HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-01-25HouseRead second time
2017-01-24HouseRead first time
2017-01-23HouseReported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101298D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581609.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1668
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1668+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1668E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1668ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0048+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1001V0005+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H10V0052+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1617+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0227+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0429HB1668+HB1668
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0434HB1668+HB1668

Bill Comments

feedback