VA HB1667 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties. Authorizes the ABC Board to grant mixed beverage licenses to certain properties located in Smyth County, notwithstanding the requirement for a liquor-by-the-drink referendum in those jurisdictions.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage licenses for certain properties in Smyth County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N 1-A) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 558 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1667ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N 1-A) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 2-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 15-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102400D |