VA HB1663 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conveyance of easement. Authorizes the Department of Conservation and Recreation to grant and convey an easement and right-of-way at High Bridge Trail State Park to Roy B. Stanton, Jr., and Pearl J. Stanton. The easement, which will follow an existing driveway across a portion of the High Bridge Trail State Park, will allow ingress and egress from U.S. Highway 460 to the Stantons' property.
Title
High Bridge Trail State Park; DCR to convey property to Roy B. Stanton, Jr., etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 80 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1663ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 23101280D-E |
2023-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1663E |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101280D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1056 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
SB1056 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
SB1056 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
Subjects
Easements
High Bridge Trail State Park
Property and Conveyances
Stanton Pearl J.
Stanton Roy B. Jr.
Uncodified Legislation
High Bridge Trail State Park
Property and Conveyances
Stanton Pearl J.
Stanton Roy B. Jr.
Uncodified Legislation